KY HB86 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.2841 and 164.2842 to identify correctional officers of urban-county governments and metropolitan correctional services divisions as law enforcement officers; allow postsecondary education tuition fees to be waived for survivors of correctional officers of urban-county government and metropolitan correctional services divisions killed or permanently and totally disabled in the line of duty.
Title
AN ACT relating to postsecondary education tuition fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-06 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |