KY HB781 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 42 to require tax return data be transmitted to the staff of the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue; establish a working group containing employees from the Legislative Reserach Commission, the Commonwealth Office of Technology, and the Department of Revenue to accomplish an efficient and effective delivery of tax return data in a format which is easily accessible, adaptable, and useable by the staff of the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue; require monthly meetings of the employee working group; allow budget unit reductions of up to 50 percent for failure to comply; amend various other sections of the KRS to conform; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to tax return data and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-04 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Taxation
Budget and Financial Administration
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Taxation