KY HB780 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 148.056 to include gender-neutral pronouns.
Title
AN ACT relating to tourism.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-09 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | introduced in House |