KY HB777 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311A.015 to create the Kentucky Board of Emergency Medical Services as an independent agency of state government; change membership of the board; amend KRS 311A.020 to change complaint investigations of ambulance services; delete language relating to transfer of the board to the Kentucky Community and Technical College System; amend KRS 311A.025 to permit hospitals exempt from certificate of need to provide transport services; amend KRS 311A.030 require distinguishing between emergency-only transportation and scheduled ambulance transportation; amend KRS 311.035 to require the board to carry out functions; amend KRS 311A.055 to make technical corrections and add complaint action language; amend KRS 311A.190 to require the board to publish a report; add compliance with HIPAA; require the board to give the Cabinet for Health and Family Services access to all data; create a new section of KRS Chapter 216B to require the Cabinet for Health and Family services to investigate and hold hearings on ambulance complaints; amend KRS 216B.020 to add conditions for ambulance services to be exempt from certificate of need; amend KRS 216B.095 to conform; amend KRS 189.910 to add vehicles operated by organ procurement organizations to the definition of emergency vehicles; amend KRS 189.940 to add vehicles operated by organ procurement organizations; amend KRS 324B.030 to add the Kentucky Board of Emergency Medical Services to the Department of Professional Licensing; create a new section of KRS Chapter 311A to require the transfer of all board employees, funds, and equipment of the board from the Kentucky Community and Technical College System; make provisions for employee retirement transfer; amend KRS 61.510 to conform; amend KRS 205.590 to establish a new technical advisory committee on emergency medical services; establish membership; add noncodified sections to set board appointments and term limits; set effective date of transfer of the board of September 1, 2022; require the board to establish a special committee to study the board’s problems and make recommendations by December 1, 2022; permit the board and the cabinet to promulgate emergency regulations to implement changes; create a legislative task force to study the provision of emergency medical services in Kentucky; require findings and recommendations by December 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2269 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 429 (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 225 (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 429 (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 225 (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 126) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | passed 87-7 |
2022-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-2 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2022-03-17 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 77-15 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-02 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Boards and Commissions
Cities
Counties
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Personnel and Employment
Public Health
Public Medical Assistance
Public Safety
Reports Mandated
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Boards and Commissions
Cities
Counties
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Personnel and Employment
Public Health
Public Medical Assistance
Public Safety
Reports Mandated
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch