KY HB76 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 237 to specify definitions for "assault weapons," "large-capacity ammunition-feeding devices," "bump stocks," and "ammunition sellers"; require background checks for private firearms sales; require reporting to law enforcement of firearm and ammunition thefts and losses; require the safe storage of firearms; and to prohibit the manufacture, sale, or transfer of a bump stock; amend KRS 395.250 to require an estate's inventory to list each firearm; amend KRS 403.735 to require judges, when issuing an order of protection, to consider whether a person against whom the order is entered should be prohibited from possessing an firearm; amend KRS 504.030 to require judges in criminal cases where a person is found guilty by reason of insanity to demand the surrender of the defendant's firearms; amend KRS 237.104 to conform; amend KRS 506.080 to specify that the offense of facilitation includes assistance in providing firearms; amend KRS 508.020 to include physical injury to a minor by virtue of the intentional discharge of a firearm within the offense of assault in the second degree; create a new section of KRS Chapter 527 to create the offense of criminal purchase or disposal of a weapon; amend KRS 527.040 to require that the sentence for a felon in possession of a firearm be served subsequent to any other felony sentence; amend KRS 527.070 to include post secondary education facilities within the existing ban on firearms in schools; amend KRS 532.030 to require the judge pronouncing a defendant guilty but mentally ill to demand the surrender of the person's firearms; create a new section of KRS Chapter 237 to require the State Police to promulgate administrative regulations relating to the licensing of persons to possess firearms and assault weapons, the registration of firearms and assault weapons, and the logging of firearms and ammunition sales effective January 1, 2020; amend KRS 532.025 to conform; amend KRS 237.115 to conform; repeal KRS 65.870; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to firearms and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-11-19HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback