KY HB758 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 177)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 177)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 224A to making findings and declarations of the General Assembly regarding the need for funding for public funding for drinking water and wastewater systems; establish a water management assistance fund which is administered by the Kentucky Infrastructure Authority to provide assistance for both capital and non-capital expenses of governmental entities that provide public drinking water and wastewater services to the public; describe the various non-capital expenses that the fund can provide funding for; amend KRS 91A.040 to make permissive the requirement for the Finance and Administration Cabinet to place a hold on the funds to cities for nonperformance of required financial audits and statements; amend KRS 224A.011 to include private water associations under the definition of "governmental agency"; amend 224A.035 to authorize the Kentucky Infrastructure Authority to make non-capital expenditure from funds that it governs; and amend KRS 224A.040 to allow expenditure for non-capital expenditures that improve the technical, managerial, or operational capacity of public drinking water and wastewater systems and allow for the purchase of obligations if the purchase does not cause interest on current or future state agency obligations to be included in gross federal income for federal tax purposes.
Title
AN ACT relating to financial assistance and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2329 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 507 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 321 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 507 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 321 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 177) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | passed 96-0 |
2022-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-30 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2022-03-25 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-25 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-03-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Auditor of Public Accounts
Audits and Auditors
Cities
Environment and Conservation
Pollution
Public Utilities
Public Works
Water Supply
Waterways and Dams
Audits and Auditors
Cities
Environment and Conservation
Pollution
Public Utilities
Public Works
Water Supply
Waterways and Dams