KY HB755 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 278 to require the Public Service Commission to open an administrative case to initiate an investigation to reduce the volatility of fuel adjustment clause charges on electric utility bills within 90 days of the effective date of the Act; require the Public Service Commission to promulgate administrative regulations to implement any changes it has prescribed to reduce the volatility of fuel adjustment clause charges on electric utility bills within 60 days of issuing an order in the administrative case.
Title
AN ACT establishing the Ratepayer Protection Task Force.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. Angie Hatton [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 489 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Energy
Public Utilities
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Energy
Public Utilities