KY HB72 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 164.2841, relating to college tuition benefits for spouses and children of specified emergency response personnel and public employees who have died in the course of their duties, to raise the eligibility age for surviving children to under the age of 26; stipulate that the unmarried widow or widower could be of any age to be eligible; specify that the beneficiary is eligible for up to 128 credit hours of undergraduate instruction; amend KRS 164.2842, relating to college tuition benefits for spouses and children of specified emergency response personnel and public employees who have been totally and permanently disabled in the course of their duties, to raise the eligibility age for children to under the age of 26; retain provision stipulating that the unmarried widow or widower could be of any age to be eligible; specify that the beneficiary is eligible for up to 128 credit hours of undergraduate instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to tuition benefits and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 178 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-03-01Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-28House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2019-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-22Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Education (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-11-05HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback