KY HB7 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Create various sections of KRS Chapter 186 to establish a regulatory framework for the operation of fully autonomous vehicles on public highways; define terms; establish requirements for autonomous vehicles and automated driving systems; require submission of a law enforcement interaction plan with the Transportation Cabinet and the Kentucky State Police and identify required elements of the plan; establish requirements for proof of insurance or self-insurance in the amount of $1 million for death or bodily injury and property damage for personal and commercial fully autonomous vehicles; require titling and registration of fully autonomous vehicles; establish the Transportation Cabinet as the sole agency responsible for administering statutes and regulations regarding fully autonomous vehicles; limit the regulatory authority of local governments in regard to the operation of fully autonomous vehicles; amend KRS 186.410 to establish that when an automated driving system is installed and engaged on a motor vehicle, the owner of a fully autonomous vehicle shall be considered operator of the vehicle for the purpose of assessing compliance with traffic or motor vehicle laws, and that the automated driving system is considered to be the licensed to operate the vehicle; create a new section of KRS Chapter 189 to exempt fully autonomous vehicles designed to be operated exclusively by an automated driving system from any vehicle equipment requirements of KRS 189.020 to KRS 189.205 that relate to vehicle operation by a human driver; amend KRS 189.635 to establish responsibility for the filing of accident reports and notification of law enforcement after accidents involving fully autonomous vehicles; amend KRS 281.010 to define terms relating to the operation of fully autonomous vehicles as motor carriers; amend KRS 281.630 to establish that any administrative regulations promulgated by the department that apply only to a human driver shall not apply to a fully autonomous vehicle; amend KRS 281.764 to require only the lead vehicle in a truck platoon to have a human driver behind the wheel of their vehicle; amend KRS 281.655 to establish minimum insurance requirements fully autonomous vehicles operating under a certificate issued under KRS Chapter 281 in the amount of $1 million for death or bodily injury and property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to autonomous vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override RSN# 3225 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 451 (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Ruling of the Chair RSN# 3199 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3201 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Roll call for SFA3 to HB 7 RSN# 3200 (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 113 (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 112 (Y: 22 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 111 (Y: 19 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-12Senatedelivered to Secretary of State
2024-04-12Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2024-04-12Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2024-04-12Senatereceived in House
2024-04-12Housepassed 21-15
2024-04-12Houseveto overridden
2024-04-12Houseposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
2024-04-12Houseto Rules (S)
2024-04-12Housereceived in Senate
2024-04-12Senatepassed 58-40
2024-04-12Senateveto overridden
2024-04-12Senateposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
2024-04-12Senatetaken from Rules
2024-04-12Senateto Rules (H)
2024-04-12Senatereceived in House
2024-04-05HouseVetoed
2024-03-28Housedelivered to Governor
2024-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2024-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2024-03-28Housereceived in House
2024-03-28Senatepassed 20-18
2024-03-28Senatefloor amendments (1) and (3) defeated
2024-03-28Senatefloor amendments (2) (4) and (5) withdrawn
2024-03-28Senate3rd reading
2024-03-27Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-26Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-25Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-22Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-21Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-15Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-14Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-12Senatefloor amendment (5) filed
2024-03-11Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-08Senatefloor amendments (3) and (4) filed
2024-03-08Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024
2024-03-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2024-03-07Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed
2024-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2024-02-20Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
2024-02-16Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2024-02-16Senatereceived in Senate
2024-02-15Housepassed 61-31 with Committee Substitute (1)
2024-02-15HouseFloor Amendments (1), (2) and (3) defeated
2024-02-15House3rd reading
2024-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 15, 2024
2024-02-09Housefloor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2024-02-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2024-02-08Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2024-02-08Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2024-01-17Houseto Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
2024-01-09Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2024-01-09Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hb7.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hb7/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hb7/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/HCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/SFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/SFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/SFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/SFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB7/SFA5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hb7/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback