KY HB68 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 95)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 95)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 186.162 to set fees for personalized license plates for recreational vehicles and to change extra fees for additional special license plates to match their initial fee upon renewal; and amends KRS 186.174 to allow issuance of personalized vehicle license plates to recreational vehicles registered under KRS 186.050(11), and to eliminate fees for a personalized standard-issue license plate in excess of those identified in KRS 186.162; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2025.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3124 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 80 (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 80 (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 95) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-5 |
2024-02-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 06, 2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-18 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |