KY HB68 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]


Create a new section of KRS Chapter 15 to require the Department of Criminal Justice Training to provide a law enforcement professional development and wellness program; outline standards for program; require program to be confidential; create a fund for the program's administration; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


AN ACT relating to law enforcement support programs, declaring an emergency, and making an appropriation therefor.



2018-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-02-12Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-02-09Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-08House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2018-02-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 8, 2018
2018-02-06Housereported favorably, to Rules
2018-02-01Houseposted in committee
2018-01-11Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-01-11House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-10Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-04Houseposted in committee
2018-01-02Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House
2017-11-28HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources

Bill Comments