KY HB638 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus paper ballots bill.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties
Counties, Charter
Counties, Urban
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties
Counties, Charter
Counties, Urban
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
Secretary of State
State Agencies