KY HB636 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 36.230 to include gender-neutral language.
Title
AN ACT relating to military affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2309 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 285 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 285 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 171) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-16 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-04 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-28 | House | introduced in House |