KY HB63 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - reported favorably, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - reported favorably, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 40.400, relating to the bonus for Vietnam veterans, to include the United States Space Force in the definition of Armed Forces; amend KRS 156.730, the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children to correct a citation to federal law; amend KRS 156.735 to include the children of National Guard and Reserve personnel within the rights granted under that compact.
Title
AN ACT relating to the military.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Bratcher [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. Chad Aull [D] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Scott Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 61 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2023-03-15 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2023-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-03 | House | introduced in House |