KY HB62 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to provide taxpayers the option to donate to the Kentucky YMCA Youth Assembly program from their individual income tax refunds; require the Department of Revenue to place the designation on the face of the Kentucky individual income tax return; provide information about the Kentucky YMCA Youth Assembly program in the return's instructions; transfer the funds designated by taxpayers to the Kentucky YMCA Youth Association by July 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to income tax checkoff programs and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors

Rep. Myron Dossett [R]Rep. Rocky Adkins [D]Rep. Lynn Bechler [R]Rep. John Blanton [R]
Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D]Rep. Charles Booker [D]Rep. Adam Bowling [R]Rep. Terri Branham Clark [D]
Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R]Rep. Randy Bridges [R]Rep. George Brown [D]Rep. McKenzie Cantrell [D]
Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D]Rep. Larry Elkins [R]Rep. Daniel Elliott [R]Rep. Joseph Fischer [R]
Rep. Kelly Flood [D]Rep. Deanna Frazier [R]Rep. Chris Freeland [R]Rep. Chris Fugate [R]
Rep. Alan Gentry [D]Rep. James Glenn [D]Rep. Jim Gooch [R]Rep. Derrick Graham [D]
Rep. Joe Graviss [D]Rep. David Hale [R]Rep. Mark Hart [R]Rep. Kathy Hinkle [D]
Rep. Cluster Howard [D]Rep. Thomas Huff [R]Rep. Joni Jenkins [D]Rep. Kim King [R]
Rep. Matthew Koch [R]Rep. Adam Koenig [R]Rep. Nima Kulkarni [D]Rep. Derek Lewis [R]
Rep. Mary Marzian [D]Rep. Ed Massey [R]Rep. Bobby McCool [R]Rep. Chad McCoy [R]
Rep. Reginald Meeks [D]Rep. Michael Meredith [R]Rep. Russ Meyer [D]Rep. Charles Miller [D]
Rep. Patti Minter [D]Rep. Jason Nemes [R]Rep. David Osborne [R]Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D]
Rep. Phillip Pratt [R]Rep. Melinda Prunty [R]Rep. Josie Raymond [D]Rep. William Reed [R]
Rep. Steve Riley [R]Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R]Rep. Bart Rowland [R]Rep. Sal Santoro [R]
Rep. Attica Scott [D]Rep. Steve Sheldon [R]Rep. John Sims [D]Rep. Maria Sorolis [D]
Rep. Diane St Onge [R]Rep. Cherlynn Stevenson [D]Rep. Jim Stewart [R]Rep. Ashley Tackett Laferty [D]
Rep. Walker Thomas [R]Rep. James Tipton [R]Rep. Tommy Turner [R]Rep. Ken Upchurch [R]
Rep. Russell Webber [R]Rep. Susan Westrom [D]Rep. Robert Wiederstein [D]Rep. Lisa Willner [D]

Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 101 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-02-25Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-22House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2019-02-20Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019
2019-02-20House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-19Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-13Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-10-15HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback