KY HB616 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 620.145, 620.180, and 620.240 to establish a 30-day case review to be submitted to a court for a child who is in the custody of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services.
Title
AN ACT relating to child dependency, neglect, or abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 305 (Y: 72 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 72-12 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |