KY HB61 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 186)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 164.7884 to allow KEES funds to be used for qualified workforce training programs; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to Kentucky educational excellence scholarships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1035 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 187 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 186)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-03-06Senateto Education (S)
2019-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-01House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-26Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-26Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2019
2019-02-26House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-25Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-21Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Education (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-09-14HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback