KY HB609 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-13 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 138.210 to set the average wholesale floor price at $2.90; amend KRS 138.220 to increase the supplemental tax on gasoline and special fuels by increasing the existing rate from five cents per gallon (cpg) on gasoline and two cpg on special fuels to eight and a half cpg for both and setting that as the minimum rate; subject the supplemental tax to annual adjustment; require annual notification to motor fuel dealers of the adjusted rate of supplemental tax for each upcoming fiscal year and annual notification to county clerks of the level of registration fees for electric and hybrid vehicles; create a new section of KRS Chapter 138 to provide a mechanism for annual adjustment of the supplemental motor fuel tax based on changes in the National Highway Construction Cost Index; allow the supplemental tax to increase or decrease no more than 10 percent from one year to the next, subject to the statutory minimum; create a new section of KRS Chapter 186 to establish a base fee for hybrid vehicles, hybrid electric plug-in vehicles, and nonhybrid electric vehicles; require the fee to be adjusted with any increase or decrease in the gasoline tax established in KRS 138.228 and Section 3 of the Act; require collection of the fee at the time of motor vehicle registration; require that all fees collected under this section be transferred to the road fund; amend KRS 186.010 to define the terms "hybrid vehicle," "hybrid electric plug-in vehicle," and "nonhybrid electric vehicle"; amend KRS 186.018 at increase the fee for a driving history record from three dollars to six dollars; amend KRS 186.040 to eliminate the $30 county clerk fee for motor carrier registrations on vehicles in excess of 44,000 pounds; amend KRS 186.050 to increase to state fee for motor vehicle registrations from $11.50 to $22; reference the fees for electric and hybrid vehicles collected under this Act; provide for the $10 late charge for vehicle registrations not renewed within 30 days of expiration; make technical correction; amend KRS 186.162 and 186.240 to conform; amend KRS 186.440, 186.450, and 186.531 to consolidate fees for driver license reinstatement, set reinstatement fee at $100, provide for distribution of funds, and provide for exceptions; amend KRS 281A.150 to increase reinstatement fees for suspended CDLs from $50 to $250; amend KRS 186A.130 and 186A.245 to set the fee for an initial title at $25 and the fee for a duplicate or replacement title at $10 and adjust the distribution of fees between the Cabinet and the county clerk; amend KRS 189.574 to increase to fee for state traffic school from $15 to $50; amend KRS 189.270 to increase fees for various overweight and overdimensional permits; create a new section of KRS Chapter 174 to create the multimodal transportation fund, specify allowable uses for moneys in the fund and appropriate funds for those purposes; EMERGENCY; Sections 1 to 3 of the Act are EFFECTIVE 7/1/18; Sections 4, 5, and 7 to 14 of the Act are EFFECTIVE January 1, 2019; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the funding of transportation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2018-03-16Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-03-16House2nd reading
2018-03-16Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-03-16Houseposted in committee
2018-03-15Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-03-15House1st reading
2018-03-15Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-03-01Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-27Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback