KY HB600 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 14.025 to abolish the Division of Administration and the Division of Business Filings in the Office of the Secretary of State; create the Office of Administration, Office of Business, and Office of Elections, and describe duties of the offices; amend KRS 355.9-513A to conform; confirm Secretary of State Executive Order 2019-01.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 304 (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 64-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |