KY HB594 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 4)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 4)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 528.010 to define "coin-operated amusement machine," "skill," "skill-based contests," and "skill game"; amend the definitions of "advancing gambling activity," "gambling," "gambling device," and "something of value"; amend KRS 528.100 to authorize the Attorney General, the Commonwealth’s attorney for any locality, or the county attorney for any locality to establish a civil penalty not to exceed $25,000 for each device for any person who conducts, finances, manages, supervises, directs, or owns a gambling device in violation of KRS Chapter 528; authorize the Attorney General, the Commonwealth’s attorney for any locality, or the county attorney for any locality to cause an action in equity to be brought in the name of the Commonwealth, to enjoin the operation of a gambling device in violation of KRS Chapter 528, and request an attachment against all devices and any moneys within those devices; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the regulation of game machines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2608 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 175 (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Table RCS# 174 (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Table RCS# 135 (Y: 42 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 134 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 49) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 175 (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Table RCS# 174 (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Table RCS# 135 (Y: 42 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 134 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 49) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 4) |
2023-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-15 | House | received in House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | passed 29-6 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment (1) withdrawn |
2023-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2023-03-10 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | returned to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2023-03-10 | Senate | taken from Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | passed 64-32 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-08 | House | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (4-title) filed to bill |
2023-03-08 | House | taken from table |
2023-03-07 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-03-03 | House | tabled |
2023-03-03 | House | floor amendment adopted Floor Amendment (1) |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee Substitute adopted |
2023-03-03 | House | 3rd reading |
2023-03-03 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-03-03 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-03 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-03-03 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-01 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | 2nd reading |
2023-03-01 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2023-02-24 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2023-02-24 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | introduced in House |