KY HB581 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new section of KRS Chapter 100 to define “retail filling station” and “electric vehicle charging station”; prohibits local governments from using the zoning process or adopting any measure to prohibit or restrict the ability of a retail filling station from locating in areas in which similar businesses may locate, to discriminate against the use or location of a retail filling station, or to treat retail filling stations differently from electric vehicle charging stations; and allows restrictions on retail filling stations, provided they are similar to those for other businesses, do not prohibit their operation, and are not in conflict with state or federal law.
Title
AN ACT relating to retail filling stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override RSN# 3223 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 447 (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3018 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 196 (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 447 (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3018 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 196 (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 186) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | received in House |
2024-04-12 | House | passed 30-7 |
2024-04-12 | House | veto overridden |
2024-04-12 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2024-04-12 | House | to Rules (S) |
2024-04-12 | House | received in Senate |
2024-04-12 | Senate | passed 77-20 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | veto overridden |
2024-04-12 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2024-04-12 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2024-04-12 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | received in House |
2024-04-02 | House | Vetoed |
2024-03-22 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-22 | House | received in House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-7 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 78-14 |
2024-02-29 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 01, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2024-02-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-16 | House | introduced in House |