KY HB562 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 620.090 to require that a child support order be established or modified within 7 days of an order of temporary removal.
Title
AN ACT relating to child support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb562.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb562/orig_bill.pdf |