KY HB557 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to include school zones in the jurisdiction of a school resource officer.
Title
AN ACT relating to school resource officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb557.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb557/orig_bill.pdf |