KY HB555 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 45.151 make technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to budget accounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2023-03-10House2nd reading
2023-03-10Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2023-03-09Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2023-03-09House1st reading
2023-03-09Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2023-02-23Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2023-02-22Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2023-02-22Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback