KY HB552 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 123)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 123)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 148.0222 to require the Kentucky Mountain Regional Recreational Authority to comply with the audit requirements of KRS Chapter 65A.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Mountain Regional Recreation Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2277 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 224 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 224 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 123) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-14 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2022-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | introduced in House |