KY HB540 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create an new section of KRS Chapter 183 to allow airports to prepare unmanned aircraft facility maps; require the map to be filed with the secretary of the airport board and published on the airport's Web site; require consultation in developing the map with the FAA control tower at an airport, if one exists; restrict the scope of a map to approach surface areas defined by federal regulations; mandate that any such map restricting the operation of unmanned aircraft published by the FAA shall be the unmanned aircraft facility map for that airport; create an new section of KRS Chapter 183 to prohibit the operator of an unmanned aircraft or the operator's supervisor from operating or allowing the operation of an unmanned aircraft in a reckless manner or a manner that would cause an incursion, exempt unmanned aircraft operated from commercial purposes in accordance with FAA regulations; amend KRS 189.011 to define the terms "operate," "operator," "unmanned aircraft," and "unmanned aircraft facility map"; amend KRS 183.990 to provide penalties.
Title
AN ACT relating to aviation safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 153) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2017-03-29 | House | Bill passed 35-1 |
2017-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2017-03-29 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2017-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2017-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Bill passed 93-0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2017-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | vetoed Bill received in House |
2017-03-27 | House | vetoed |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | Bill passed 87-3 |
2017-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a consent bill |
2017-03-07 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 72-3 |
2017-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2017-02-17 | House | introduced in House |