KY HB533 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.010 and 141.0101 to update the Internal Revenue Code conforming date to Dec. 31, 2013, exclude from the update any change to the phase out of itemized deductions, make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | House | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-05 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB533.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB533/bill.doc |