KY HB53 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 11)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 11)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.540 to add one representative of a recognized consumer advocacy group representing persons reentering society following incarceration to the Advisory Council for Medical Assistance; amend KRS 205.590 to amend the membership of the Technical Advisory Committee on Consumer Rights and Client Needs, amend the membership of the Technical Advisory Committee on Behavioral Health, and to create a Technical Advisory Committee on Persons Returning to Society from Incarceration to act in an advisory capacity to the Advisory Council for Medical Assistance.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Advisory Council for Medical Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1643 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 71 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 71 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 11) |
2021-03-05 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | received in House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2021-02-09 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2021 |
2021-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2020-09-17 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Corrections and Correctional Facilities, State
Courts
Medicaid
Mental Health
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Assistance
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies
Courts
Medicaid
Mental Health
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Assistance
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies