KY HB525 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - floor amendments (5) and (6-title) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (7) and (8-title) filed to bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 161.250 and 161.260 to provide that nominations to be placed on the ballot for the seven elected trustees of the Teachers' Retirement System board shall for elections occurring after July 1, 2019, consist of one individual submitted by each of the following organizations: the Kentucky Education Association, the Kentucky Retired Teachers Association, the Kentucky School Boards Association, the Kentucky Association of School Superintendents, the Kentucky Association of Professional Educators, the Kentucky Society of Certified Public Accountants, and the Kentucky Bankers Association; require the Kentucky Society of Certified Public Accountants nominee to be a certified public accountant and require the Kentucky Bankers Association nominee to have financial or banking experience.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Teachers' Retirement System board of trustees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06Housefloor amendments (5) and (6-title) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (7) and (8-title) filed to bill
2019-03-05Housefloor amendments (1) and (3) filed to bill; floor amendments (2) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-03-01Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-03-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-28Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-26Houseposted in committee
2019-02-21Houseto State Government (H)
2019-02-20Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback