KY HB522 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 6 to establish the procedure for seating members of the General Assembly; create a new section of KRS Chapter 120 to provide for an automatic recount in elections of constitutional officers, members of Congress, and members of the General Assembly when the vote margin is 0.5% or less; amend KRS 120.185 to provide for a recount in elections of the Governor and Lieutenant Governor, members of Congress, and members of the General Assembly; amend KRS 120.195, 120.205, and 120.215 to establish the procedures for any election contest involving the Governor and Lieutenant Governor and members of the General Assembly; amend KRS 117.295, 118.775, 120.017, and 120.155 to conform; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to elections and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 287 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-03-13Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-12House3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-04Housereturned to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2019-03-04House1st reading
2019-03-04Housetaken from Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2019-02-25Houseposted in committee
2019-02-21Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2019-02-20Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback