KY HB518 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.639 to change the definition of "private psychiatric hospital"; amend KRS 205.640 to provide that the disproportionate share program shall be established by administrative regulations; require one of the three pools for distribution of disproportionate share funds to be the percentage allowable by federal law up to 19.08 percent for private psychiatric hospitals and state mental hospitals; require any remaining disproportionate share funds from private psychiatric care hospitals and state mental to be distributed between acute care hospitals and university hospitals; include state mental hospitals in the Medical Assistance Revolving Trust Fund; provide that a hospital will receive distributions for indigent care if the hospital meets the requirements of administrative regulations promulgated by the cabinet; require the Department for Medicaid Services to make a final determination of each hospital's annual payment amount upon notification through the Federal Register of the annual federal disproportionate share hospital allotment for the state; require the department to issue to each hospital either a lump-sum payment or divide the lump-sum payment into multiple distribution payments if fiscally necessary; require hospitals to submit any supporting documentation to substantiate compliance with the audit requirements as established by federal regulations; make technical changes.
Title
AN ACT relating to Medicaid.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Lee [D] | Rep. Darryl Owens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 142) | |
2010-04-01 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-01 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-01 | received in House | |
2010-03-29 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 29, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-22 | to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2010-03-18 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-17 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-16 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-11 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-10 | posting waived | |
2010-03-10 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-26 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2010-02-25 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB518.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB518/bill.doc |