KY HB517 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 197)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 197)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 405.021 to create a presumption that grandparent visitation is in the child's best interest when there is a significant and viable relationship between the child and grandparent, and the parent who is the child of the grandparent is deceased; amend KRS 620.090 to require the court to consider granting visitation rights to the grandparents who are not granted temporary custody.
Title
AN ACT relating to grandparent visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 759 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 332 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 332 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 197) |
2018-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | House | received in House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2018-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, April 13, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-20 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 |
2018-03-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-28 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB517.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB517/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB517/vote_history.pdf |