KY HB515 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 529 in regard to commercial sexual activity with a minor which removes being mistaken about a minor's age as a defense to prosecution; amend KRS 531.330 to conform; amend KRS 529.170 to follow the structure for defenses to prosecution used throughout the penal code.
Title
AN ACT relating to human trafficking.
Sponsors
Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Leslie Combs [D] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-24 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | introduced in House |