KY HB513 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 196)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of Subchapter 73 of KRS Chapter 224 to define "sewage" and "small wastewater treatment plant"; allow the Energy and Environment Cabinet to require structural analyses of small wastewater treatment plants under certain conditions; allow the cabinet to require small wastewater treatment plants' owners to secure financial or performance measures that may include insurance policies or financial instruments, surety bonds or other instrument or reasonable guaranties, the utilization of asset management plans or capacity, management, operation and maintenance measures, and financial assurance measures that ensure the plant operates in conformity with applicable laws and that the plant is maintained properly; allow the cabinet have the ability to seek the appointment of a permanent or temporary receiver, custodian, or fiduciary to assume the management and operations of a plant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to privately owned small wastewater treatment plants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 514 (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Concur SFA 2 RCS# 513 (Y: 58 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 512 (Y: 57 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 2, SFTA 1 RSN# 709 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 311 (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 196)
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14HouseBill passed 66-25
2018-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-04-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-04-13Houseto Rules (H)
2018-04-13Housereceived in House
2018-04-13Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendments (1-title) and (2)
2018-04-13Senateplaced in the Orders of the Day for Friday, April 13, 2018
2018-04-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-04-02Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-04-02Senatetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2018-03-29Senatefloor amendment (1-title) floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 2, 2018
2018-03-22Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-21Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-19Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-16Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-15House3rd reading, passed 84-4 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-14Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2018-03-13Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018
2018-03-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-08Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-06Houseposted in committee
2018-02-28Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2018-02-26Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback