KY HB510 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a new subchapter under KRS Chapter 154 and create new sections thereof to allow the earn, learn, and recover tax credit in an amount up to 50% of the costs incurred by an approved company for tuition or other educational expenses paid on behalf of a qualified employee, not to exceed $2,000; create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to allow the tax credit against the income taxes and the limited liability entity tax for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, but before January 1, 2024; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the tax credit; amend KRS 131.190 to allow the Department of Revenue to report confidential data.
Title
AN ACT relating to a new tax credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Tate [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Alcoholism
Economic Development
Substance Abuse
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual
Economic Development
Substance Abuse
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb510.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb510/orig_bill.pdf |