KY HB51 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.133 to require local law enforcement agencies and Kentucky State Police to enforce immigration laws; create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to define terms, including "sanctuary" and "sanctuary policy"; prohibit local governments from adopting sanctuary policies; establish hearing procedures for determination of sanctuary status; provide for the withholding of state funding from sanctuaries; create new sections of KRS Chapter 164 to prohibit postsecondary educational institutions from enrolling employing or contracting with illegal aliens; require postsecondary educational institutions to keep records of immigration status; provide for the withholding of state funding from postsecondary educational institutions that enroll, employ, or contract with illegal aliens; limit who may be considered a Kentucky resident for in-state tuition purposes; EFFECTIVE in part January 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to compliance with state and federal law.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Bechler [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] |
Rep. Joseph Fischer [R] | Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. Robert Goforth [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Thomas Huff [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Bobby McCool [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
Rep. Nancy Tate [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. Tommy Turner [R] | Rep. Ken Upchurch [R] |
Rep. Les Yates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-09-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Crimes and Punishments
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Federal Laws and Regulations
Immigration
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Officers and Employees
Sheriffs
Universities and Colleges
Crimes and Punishments
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Federal Laws and Regulations
Immigration
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Officers and Employees
Sheriffs
Universities and Colleges