KY HB5 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 5)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 5)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.028 to remove the provisions related to temporary reorganizations; repeal KRS 12.027, which requires temporary reorganizations to be set forth by executive order; EMERGENCY
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganizations and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1524 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 37 (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1506 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 15 (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 37 (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1506 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 15 (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 5) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-02-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-02-02 | Senate | received in House |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill passed 30-7 |
2021-02-02 | House | veto overridden |
2021-02-02 | House | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-02-02 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-02-02 | House | to Rules (S) |
2021-02-02 | House | received in Senate |
2021-02-02 | Senate | bill passed 71-23 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-02-02 | Senate | placed in the Orders of the Day for consideration of Governor's veto. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | received in House |
2021-01-19 | House | Vetoed |
2021-01-09 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-01-09 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-01-09 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-01-09 | House | received in House |
2021-01-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 29-7 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 9, 2021 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-01-07 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-01-07 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-01-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-22 |
2021-01-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 7, 2021 |
2021-01-06 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-01-05 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-05 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | 1st reading |
2021-01-05 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to State Government (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |