KY HB5 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 13)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 13)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 210.290, relating to public guardianship, to specify when the Cabinet for Health and Family Services may be appointed as a resident's limited guardian, guardian, limited conservator, or conservator; amend KRS 387.510 to provide that a guardian or limited guardian is to manage the personal affairs of a disabled person; amend KRS 387.540 to allow a physician assistant to be part of an interdisciplinary evaluation team; amend KRS 387.570 and 387.580 to retain the right to a jury trial in a guardianship competency hearing if demanded by or on behalf of any party; amend KRS 387.590 to clarify that the same individual, agency, or corporation may be both a guardian and a conservator; amend KRS 387.610 to allow an advanced practice registered nurse or a physician assistant working within his or her scope of practice to verify a renewal petition for guardianship or conservatorship; amend KRS 387.660 to remove custody from a guardian's powers and duties; amend KRS 387.680 to clarify that a limited conservator or conservator may establish or place financial resources in a trust; amend KRS 387.670, 387.700, and 387.710 to conform.
Title
AN ACT regarding guardianship and conservatorship of partially disabled or disabled adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 477 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 93 (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 93 (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 13) |
2018-03-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-01 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-01 | House | received in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-3 with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 5, 2018 |
2018-02-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-31 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-01-05 | House | introduced in House |