KY HB499 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-01 - returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-01 - returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 148 to establish the Kentucky State Park Centennial Commission to coordinate celebration of 100 years of the park system; establish membership of the commission; establish a sunset date for the provisions.
Title
AN ACT establishing celebratory commissions for the Kentucky State Parks Centennial, the Kentucky State Semiquincentennial, and the Old Fort Harrod Semiquincentennial.
Sponsors
Rep. Ashley Tackett Laferty [D] | Rep. Tommy Turner [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 297 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-04-01 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-04-01 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | returned to Rules |
2020-03-18 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-28 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | introduced in House |