KY HB499 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend the 2018-2020 State/Executive Branch Budget to stipulate that the salary of the Chief Information Officer not exceed the salary of the highest-paid Chief Information Officer of the states contiguous to Kentucky; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT amending the 2018-2020 State/Executive Branch Budget and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 181 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28Senaterecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-03-14Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-03-12Senate2nd reading
2019-03-12Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-03-04Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-03-01Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-28House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2019-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-22Houseposted in committee
2019-02-21Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-20Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback