KY HB497 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 182)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 196 to require the Department of Corrections (DOC) to issue to released prisoners documentation of their criminal history, institutional history, other relevent information, and a certificate of employability; to require DOC to assist prisoners with writing resumes;createa Class B misdemeanor for a person who falsely claims to have a certificate of employability; create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to prioritize provision of Medicaid benefits to prisoners 30 days prior to release upon receipt of a Medicaid Section 1115 waiver; amend KRS 205.2005 to exempt all individuals residing in Kentucky from the application of 21 USC sec. 862a(a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to persons convicted of crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 435 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1773 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 234 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 182)
2021-03-30Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-29HouseBill passed 91-0
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2021-03-16Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2021-03-16Housetaken from Rules
2021-03-16Houseto Rules (H)
2021-03-16Housereceived in House
2021-03-16Senatepassed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2021-03-16Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn
2021-03-16Senate3rd reading
2021-03-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021
2021-03-15Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill
2021-03-15Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2021-03-12Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2021-03-12Senate1st reading
2021-03-12Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2021-03-11Senateto Judiciary (S)
2021-03-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2021-03-05House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2021-03-04Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021
2021-03-04House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-03Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-03-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2021-03-01Houseposted in committee
2021-03-01Houseto Judiciary (H)
2021-02-10Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-10Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/hb497.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/hb497/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/hb497/bill.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/21RS/hb497/CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/21RS/hb497/LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/21RS/hb497/HCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/21RS/hb497/HCS1CI.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/hb497/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/21RS/hb497/SCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/21RS/hb497/SCS1CI.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback