KY HB497 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 165)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 165)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 202A.011 to include physician assistants in the definition of "qualified mental health professional."
Title
AN ACT relating to physician assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 451 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 678 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 330 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 678 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 330 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 165) |
2018-04-02 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill passed 92-0 |
2018-04-02 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-02 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-02 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-29 | House | received in House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-28 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | introduced in House |