KY HB493 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.740 and 403.745 to provide that if the adverse party has been served with the summons, the hearing, currently required within 14 days of issuance of the summons, may be continued beyond the 14-day period if the parties are in agreement.
Title
AN ACT relating to protective orders.
Sponsors
Rep. John Tilley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd reading | |
2011-03-02 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-03-01 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-03-01 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-03-01 | 1st reading | |
2011-03-01 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-02-28 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-25 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2011 | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-18 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-15 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2011-02-14 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB493.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB493/bill.doc |