KY HB49 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]


Amend KRS 454.210 to expand personal jurisdiction of courts over nonresidents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


AN ACT relating to personal jurisdiction.



2018-01-22Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-01-19Senatereceived in Senate
2018-01-18House3rd reading, passed 85-2 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2), and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-01-18Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-01-17Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-01-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018
2018-01-11House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-10Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-01-04Houseposted in committee
2018-01-02Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House
2017-10-13HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources

Bill Comments