KY HB482 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.315 to add the chief of police of the Owensboro Police Department and the director of the Northern Kentucky Police and Sheriff's Training Center to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3174 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 165 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04Housesigned by Governor
2024-03-28Housedelivered to Governor
2024-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2024-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2024-03-28Housereceived in House
2024-03-28Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2024-03-28Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024
2024-03-27Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2024-03-26Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2024-03-26Senate1st reading
2024-03-26Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2024-03-21Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2024-02-28Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2024-02-28Senatereceived in Senate
2024-02-27House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2024-02-26Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 27, 2024
2024-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2024-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2024-02-16Houseto Local Government (H)
2024-02-07Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2024-02-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback