KY HB481 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-29)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to prohibit trafficking in or possession of synthetic drugs including provisions for a maximum fine of double the gain from the commission of the offense; amend KRS 218A.010 to define "synthetic cannabinoids or piperazines," "synthetic cathinones," and "synthetic drugs"; amend KRS 218A.020 to permit the Office of Drug Control Policy to make recommendations to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services regarding controlled substances scheduling; amend KRS 218A.141, relating to cleanup costs for drug trafficking, to include trafficking in synthetic drugs; amend KRS 218A.350 to create a penalty structure mirroring that established for trafficking in synthetic drugs; amend KRS 218A.1411, relating to trafficking in the vicinity of a school, to include synthetic drugs; amend KRS 218A.410, relating to forfeiture in drug cases, to add trafficking in synthetic drugs; amend KRS 218A.992 to include trafficking in synthetic drugs as an offense triggering a penalty increase when committed while in possession of a firearm; amend KRS 243.500, relating to liquor licenses revocations, to include synthetic drugs; repeal KRS 218A.1426, 218A.1427, 218A.1428, 218A.1453, 218A.1454, 218A.1455; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to controlled substances and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R]Rep. Royce Adams [D]Rep. Rocky Adkins [D]Rep. Linda Belcher [D]
Rep. Johnny Bell [D]Rep. Dwight Butler [R]Rep. John Carney [R]Rep. Larry Clark [D]
Rep. Hubert Collins [D]Rep. Leslie Combs [D]Rep. Will Coursey [D]Rep. Jesse Crenshaw [D]
Rep. Robert Damron [D]Rep. Jim DeCesare [R]Rep. Mitchel Denham [D]Rep. Myron Dossett [R]
Rep. Theodore Edmonds [D]Sen. C.B. Embry [R]Rep. David Floyd [R]Rep. Danny Ford [R]
Rep. James Glenn [D]Rep. Derrick Graham [D]Rep. Jeff Greer [D]Sen. Sara Gregory [R]
Rep. Melvin Henley [D]Rep. Jeff Hoover [R]Rep. David Housman [R]Rep. Regina Huff [R]
Rep. Wade Hurt [R]Rep. Joni Jenkins [D]Rep. Dennis Keene [D]Rep. Kim King [R]
Rep. Martha King [D]Rep. Adam Koenig [R]Rep. Jimmie Lee [D]Rep. Mary Marzian [D]
Rep. Donna Mayfield [R]Rep. Thomas McKee [D]Rep. Michael Meredith [R]Rep. Charles Miller [D]
Rep. Terry Mills [D]Rep. Tim Moore [R]Rep. Lonnie Napier [R]Rep. Fred Nesler [D]
Rep. David Osborne [R]Rep. Sannie Overly [D]Rep. Darryl Owens [D]Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D]
Rep. Tanya Pullin [D]Rep. Ryan Quarles [R]Rep. Marie Rader [R]Rep. Rick Rand [D]
Rep. Jody Richards [D]Rep. Steven Riggs [D]Rep. Tom Riner [D]Rep. Carl Rollins [D]
Rep. Bart Rowland [R]Rep. Steven Rudy [R]Rep. Sal Santoro [R]Rep. John Short [D]
Rep. Arnold Simpson [D]Rep. Kevin Sinnette [D]Rep. Rita Smart [D]Rep. Fitz Steele [D]
Rep. Jim Stewart [R]Rep. Wilson Stone [D]Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D]Rep. Thomas Thompson [D]
Rep. John Tilley [D]Rep. Ben Waide [R]Rep. Jim Wayne [D]Rep. Alecia Webb-Edgington [R]
Rep. Susan Westrom [D]Rep. Brent Yonts [D]Rep. Jill York [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 signed by Governor (Acts ch. 108)
2012-03-30 delivered to Governor
2012-03-30 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2012-03-29 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2012-03-29 received in House
2012-03-29 3rd reading, passed 35-2
2012-03-29 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2012
2012-03-27 reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2012-03-26 returned to Judiciary (S)
2012-03-26 1st reading
2012-03-26 taken from Judiciary (S)
2012-03-19 to Judiciary (S)
2012-03-14 received in Senate
2012-03-13 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute
2012-03-07 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 8, 2012
2012-03-01 2nd reading, to Rules
2012-02-29 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2012-02-28 posting waived
2012-02-28 to Judiciary (H)
2012-02-27 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback