KY HB48 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-13)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 30)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-13)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 30)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 12 of KRS Chapter 304 to establish certain insurance practices relating to the reimbursement of pharmacists; amend KRS 304.14-135 to establish a clean claim form for the reimbursement of certain pharmacist services or procedures; amend KRS 304.17A-844 and 304.17B-011 to conform; amend KRS 18A.225 to require the state employee health plan to comply with pharmacist reimbursement requirements; amend KRS 342.020 to require workers' compensation employers, insurers, and payment obligors to comply with pharmacist reimbursement requirements.
Title
AN ACT relating to reimbursement for pharmacist services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1693 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 179 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 179 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 30) |
2021-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2021-03-04 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 2, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-11 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2020-09-16 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |