KY HB475 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-11)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Propose to amend Section 181 of the Constitution of Kentucky to permit the General Assembly to authorize a county, city, town, or municipal corporation to assess and collect local taxes and fees that are not otherwise in conflict with the Constitution; provide ballot question with proposed amendment; submit to voters for ratification or rejection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT proposing an amendment to Section 181 of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to the General Assembly's authority over local revenue options.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 193 (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-09Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-09Housebill reconsidered
2020-03-06Housedefeated 49-17
2020-03-06Housefloor amendment (4) ruled not germane
2020-03-06House3rd reading
2020-03-02Housefloor amendments (4) and (5) filed
2020-03-02Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020
2020-02-28Housefloor amendments (1), (2) and (3-title) filed
2020-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-24Houseposted in committee
2020-02-24Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2020-02-21Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback