KY HB474 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 314.011 to change the definitions of "advanced practice registered nursing" and "licensed practical nursing practice" related to the prescribing and ordering of medication, treatments, drugs, devices, and diagnostic tests; amend KRS 314.021 to make a change to a licensed individual's educational preparation and experience; amend KRS 314.042 to make changes to the requirements for an applicant to be licensed as an advanced practice registered nurse; amend KRS 314.107 related to a licensee's mailing and electronic mail address; amend KRS 314.108 related to the timeline of notification of disciplinary actions; repeal KRS 314.196.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to nursing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
2020-03-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-09Houseposted in committee
2020-02-24Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-02-21Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback