KY HB474 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 314.011 to change the definitions of "advanced practice registered nursing" and "licensed practical nursing practice" related to the prescribing and ordering of medication, treatments, drugs, devices, and diagnostic tests; amend KRS 314.021 to make a change to a licensed individual's educational preparation and experience; amend KRS 314.042 to make changes to the requirements for an applicant to be licensed as an advanced practice registered nurse; amend KRS 314.107 related to a licensee's mailing and electronic mail address; amend KRS 314.108 related to the timeline of notification of disciplinary actions; repeal KRS 314.196.
Title
AN ACT relating to nursing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-24 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-02-21 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb474.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb474/orig_bill.pdf |